CA SCR41 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session


Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 64, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]


Relative to California's Chess Month.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.


Chess Month.


Roll Calls

2015-06-18 - SCR 41 Hancock Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-06-15 - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-30 - Senate 3rd Reading SCR41 Hancock (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]


2015-06-23SenateChaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 64, Statutes of 2015.
2015-06-23SenateEnrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 1:15 p.m.
2015-06-18SenateIn Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2015-06-18AssemblyRead. Adopted. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 2039.) Ordered to the Senate.
2015-06-15AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 15).
2015-06-11AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2015-04-30AssemblyIn Assembly. Held at Desk.
2015-04-30SenateRead. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 835.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2015-04-14SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2015-04-13SenateIntroduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. (Corrected April 23).

California State Sources

Bill Comments