CA SCR35 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 54-32-1)
Status: Passed on July 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 129, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 54-32-1)
Status: Passed on July 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-22 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 129, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Anti-Semitism.
Title
Anti-Semitism.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-07-16 - Senate - Unfinished Business SCR35 Stone Concurrence (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - Assembly - Be adopted as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR35 Stone (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Senate - Be adopted as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-23 - Assembly - Be adopted as amended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-05-14 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR35 Stone (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-29 - Senate - Be adopted as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-22 | Senate | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 129, Statutes of 2015. |
2015-07-22 | Senate | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 1:30 p.m. |
2015-07-16 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1983.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2015-07-14 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2015-07-13 | Assembly | Read. Amended. Adopted. (Page 2359.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2015-07-09 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-06-30 | Assembly | Amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-06-29 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (June 23). |
2015-05-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. |
2015-05-14 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 996.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. |
2015-05-06 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2015-05-05 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 815.) (April 29). |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Set for hearing April 29. |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on ED. |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |