CA SCR35 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-05-28 - To Com. on RULES.
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-05-28 - To Com. on RULES.
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Foster Care Month.
Title
Foster Care Month.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-05-18 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR35 Steinberg (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-28 | To Com. on RULES. | |
2009-05-18 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |
2009-05-18 | Read and adopted. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 927.) To Assembly. | |
2009-05-06 | Withdrawn from committee. Placed on third reading. | |
2009-04-20 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. |