CA SCR32 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 138, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 138, Statutes of 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to United States Forest Service Firefighter Brent Michael Witham Memorial Highway.
Title
United States Forest Service Firefighter Brent Michael Witham Memorial Highway.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-08-22 - Senate - Unfinished Business SCR32 Morrell Concurrence (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-19 - Assembly - SCR 32 Morrell Senate Third Reading By Obernolte (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-14 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-01 - Assembly - Be adopted, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Senate - Consent Calendar SCR32 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-19 - Assembly - SCR 32 Morrell Senate Third Reading By Obernolte (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-08-14 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-07-01 - Assembly - Be adopted, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Senate - Consent Calendar SCR32 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-28 | Senate | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 138, Statutes of 2019. |
2019-08-28 | Senate | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m. |
2019-08-22 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2237.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2019-08-20 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2019-08-19 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2754.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2019-08-14 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 14). |
2019-08-12 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-07-02 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2019-05-09 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1005.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2019-05-06 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Set for hearing May 6. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 806.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Set for hearing April 23. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |