CA SCR32 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-4)
Status: Passed on May 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 21, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-4)
Status: Passed on May 23 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 21, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Senior Volunteer Month.
Title
Senior Volunteer Month.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-19 - Assembly - SCR 32 Correa Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-05-16 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-04-28 - Senate - W/O REF. TO FILE SCR32 Correa (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-16 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-04-28 - Senate - W/O REF. TO FILE SCR32 Correa (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-23 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 21, Statutes of 2011. | |
2011-05-23 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 1 p.m. | |
2011-05-19 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |
2011-05-19 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1455.) Ordered to the Senate. | |
2011-05-17 | From committee: Be adopted as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 16). | |
2011-05-05 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2011-04-28 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |
2011-04-28 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to special consent calendar. Read. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 775.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2011-04-04 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |