CA SCR31 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Broadly Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 137, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Broadly Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 23 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 137, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the Katcho Achadjian Memorial Highway.
Title
Katcho Achadjian Memorial Highway.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-08-14 - Assembly - SCR 31 Laird Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-07-05 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-11 - Senate - Consent Calendar SCR31 Laird et al (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-07-05 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-11 - Senate - Consent Calendar SCR31 Laird et al (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-25 - Senate - Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-08-23 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 137, Statutes of 2023. | |
2023-08-23 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m. | |
2023-08-15 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2023-08-14 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2686.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2023-08-14 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2023-07-06 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (July 5). |
2023-05-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2023-05-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1056.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2023-05-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2023-05-08 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Set for hearing May 8. |
2023-04-26 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0. Page 905.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2023-04-03 | Senate | Set for hearing April 25. |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |