CA SCR31 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 25, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-21 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 25, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to California Library Week.
Title
California Library Week.
Sponsors
Sen. Lois Wolk [D] | Sen. Jerry Hill [D] | Sen. Carol Liu [D] | Sen. Jim Nielsen [R] |
Asm. Mike Gatto [D] | Asm. Richard Gordon [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-16 - Assembly - SCR 31 Wolk Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR31 Wolk (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR31 Wolk (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-21 | Senate | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 25, Statutes of 2015. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 9:30 a.m. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2015-04-16 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 978.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2015-04-09 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 9). |
2015-04-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-03-19 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 358.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-03-18 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |