CA SCR29 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 65-19-1)
Status: Passed on July 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 65, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to California Holocaust Memorial Day.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

California Holocaust Memorial Day.

Sponsors

Sen. Benjamin Allen [D]Sen. Josh Becker [D]Sen. Steve Glazer [D]Sen. Bob Hertzberg [D]
Sen. Josh Newman [D]Sen. Susan Rubio [D]Sen. Henry Stern [D]Sen. Scott Wiener [D]
Asm. Rebecca Bauer-Kahan [D]Asm. Marc Berman [D]Asm. Blanca Rubio [D]Asm. Richard Bloom [D]
Asm. Laura Friedman [D]Asm. Jesse Gabriel [D]Asm. Marc Levine [D]Asm. Jose Medina [D]
Asm. Adrin Nazarian [D]Asm. Chris Ward [D]Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D]Asm. Akilah Weber [D]
Asm. Joaquin Arambula [D]Asm. Steve Bennett [D]Asm. Franklin Bigelow [R]Asm. Tasha Horvath [D]
Asm. Autumn Burke [D]Asm. Lisa Calderon [D]Asm. Wendy Carrillo [D]Asm. Sabrina Cervantes [D]
Asm. Edwin Chau [D]Asm. Phillip Chen [R]Asm. David Chiu [D]Asm. Steven Choi [R]
Asm. Ken Cooley [D]Asm. Jim Cooper [D]Asm. Cristina Garcia [D]Asm. Jordan Cunningham [R]
Asm. Tom Daly [D]Asm. Laurie Davies [R]Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D]Asm. Heath Flora [R]
Asm. Vince Fong [R]Asm. Jim Frazier [D]Asm. James Gallagher [R]Asm. Mike Gipson [D]
Asm. Adam Gray [D]Asm. Tim Grayson [D]Asm. Chris Holden [D]Asm. Jacqui Irwin [D]
Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D]Asm. Ash Kalra [D]Asm. Kevin Kiley [R]Asm. Tom Lackey [R]
Asm. Alex Lee [D]Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D]Asm. Evan Low [D]Asm. Luz Rivas [D]
Asm. Brian Maienschein [D]Asm. Devon Mathis [R]Asm. Chad Mayes [I]Asm. Kevin McCarty [D]
Asm. Megan Dahle [R]Asm. Kevin Mullin [D]Asm. Al Muratsuchi [D]Asm. Janet Nguyen [R]
Asm. Patrick O'Donnell [D]Asm. Jim Patterson [R]Asm. Cottie Petrie-Norris [D]Asm. Bill Quirk [D]
Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D]Asm. James Ramos [D]Asm. Anthony Rendon [D]Asm. Eloise Reyes [D]
Asm. Robert Rivas [D]Asm. Rudy Salas [D]Asm. Miguel Santiago [D]Asm. Kelly Seyarto [R]
Asm. Thurston Smith [R]Asm. Mark Stone [D]Asm. Philip Ting [D]Asm. Suzette Martinez Valladares [R]
Asm. Carlos Villapudua [D]Asm. Randy Voepel [R]Asm. Marie Waldron [R]Asm. Buffy Wicks [D]
Asm. Jim Wood [D]

Roll Calls

2021-07-01 - Assembly - SCR 29 Wiener Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR29 Wiener et al (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-09 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 65, Statutes of 2021.
2021-07-09 Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11 a.m.
2021-07-05SenateIn Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2021-07-01AssemblyRead. Adopted. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2208.) Ordered to the Senate.
2021-07-01AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2021-06-24AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 24).
2021-04-15AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2021-04-08AssemblyIn Assembly. Held at Desk.
2021-04-08SenateRead. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 715.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2021-04-07SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2021-03-24SenateIntroduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback