CA SCR28 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 60-20)
Status: Passed on May 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 38, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 60-20)
Status: Passed on May 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 38, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to California Mental Health No Stigma Week.
Title
California Mental Health No Stigma Week.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-20 - Senate - Special Consent #5 SCR28 Block (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-06 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-04 - Senate - Special Consent Cal SCR28 Block (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-06 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-04 - Senate - Special Consent Cal SCR28 Block (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-23 | Senate | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 38, Statutes of 2013. |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11 a.m. |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 973.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2013-05-09 | Assembly | Read. Amended. Adopted. (Page 1340.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2013-05-06 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 6). |
2013-04-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-04-04 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 412.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2013-04-03 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2013-04-01 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. (Corrected April 4.) |