CA SCR28 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-10)
Status: Passed on May 29 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 39, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-10)
Status: Passed on May 29 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 39, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to senior volunteers.
Title
Senior Volunteer Month.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-05-21 - Assembly - SCR 28 Correa Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-18 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-23 - Senate - W/O REF. TO FILE SCR28 Correa (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-18 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-23 - Senate - W/O REF. TO FILE SCR28 Correa (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 39, Statutes of 2009. | |
2009-05-29 | Enrolled. To Secretary of State at 10 a.m. | |
2009-05-21 | In Senate. To enrollment. | |
2009-05-21 | Read and adopted. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1632.) To Senate. | |
2009-05-18 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on May 18.) | |
2009-04-30 | To Com. on RULES. | |
2009-04-23 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |
2009-04-23 | Withdrawn from committee. To Special Consent Calendar. Read and adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 623.) To Assembly. | |
2009-03-23 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. |