CA SCR23 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 37, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 37, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Chabad Day.
Title
Chabad Day.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-05-26 - Senate - Special Consent #6 SCR23 Steinberg (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-14 - Assembly - SCR 23 Steinberg Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-11 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-23 - Senate - W/O REF. TO FILE SCR23 Steinberg (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-14 - Assembly - SCR 23 Steinberg Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-11 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-23 - Senate - W/O REF. TO FILE SCR23 Steinberg (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-29 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 37, Statutes of 2009. | |
2009-05-29 | Enrolled. To Secretary of State at 10 a.m. | |
2009-05-26 | Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1010.) To enrollment. | |
2009-05-21 | To Special Consent Calendar. | |
2009-05-21 | To Special Consent Calendar. | |
2009-05-14 | In Senate. To unfinished business. | |
2009-05-14 | Read and adopted. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 1472.) To Senate. | |
2009-05-11 | From committee: Be adopted. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on May 11.) | |
2009-05-04 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RULES. | |
2009-04-02 | To Com. on RULES. | |
2009-03-23 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |
2009-03-23 | Withdrawn from committee. Read and adopted. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 326.) To Assembly. | |
2009-03-16 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. |