CA SCR21 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 74-20)
Status: Passed on May 6 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-06 - Read. Adopted. (Ayes 76. Noes 0.) Ordered to the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to Justice Ruth Bader Ginsburg Day.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Justice Ruth Bader Ginsburg Day.

Sponsors

Sen. Susan Rubio [D]Asm. Blanca Rubio [D]Asm. Cristina Garcia [D]Asm. Jesse Gabriel [D]
Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D]Asm. Akilah Weber [D]Sen. Benjamin Allen [D]Asm. Joaquin Arambula [D]
Sen. Toni Atkins [D]Asm. Rebecca Bauer-Kahan [D]Sen. Josh Becker [D]Asm. Steve Bennett [D]
Asm. Marc Berman [D]Asm. Franklin Bigelow [R]Asm. Richard Bloom [D]Asm. Tasha Horvath [D]
Asm. Autumn Burke [D]Sen. Anna Caballero [D]Asm. Lisa Calderon [D]Asm. Wendy Carrillo [D]
Asm. Sabrina Cervantes [D]Asm. Edwin Chau [D]Asm. Phillip Chen [R]Asm. David Chiu [D]
Asm. Steven Choi [R]Asm. Ken Cooley [D]Asm. Jim Cooper [D]Asm. Jordan Cunningham [R]
Asm. Tom Daly [D]Asm. Laurie Davies [R]Sen. Maria Durazo [D]Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D]
Sen. Susan Eggman [D]Asm. Heath Flora [R]Asm. Vince Fong [R]Asm. Jim Frazier [D]
Asm. Laura Friedman [D]Asm. James Gallagher [R]Asm. Mike Gipson [D]Sen. Steve Glazer [D]
Sen. Lena Gonzalez [D]Asm. Adam Gray [D]Asm. Tim Grayson [D]Sen. Bob Hertzberg [D]
Asm. Chris Holden [D]Sen. Melissa Hurtado [D]Asm. Jacqui Irwin [D]Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D]
Asm. Ash Kalra [D]Sen. Sydney Kamlager-Dove [D]Asm. Kevin Kiley [R]Asm. Tom Lackey [R]
Asm. Marc Levine [D]Sen. Connie Leyva [D]Sen. Monique Limon [D]Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D]
Asm. Evan Low [D]Asm. Luz Rivas [D]Asm. Brian Maienschein [D]Asm. Devon Mathis [R]
Asm. Kevin McCarty [D]Asm. Jose Medina [D]Asm. Megan Dahle [R]Sen. Melissa Melendez [R]
Asm. Al Muratsuchi [D]Asm. Adrin Nazarian [D]Sen. Josh Newman [D]Asm. Janet Nguyen [R]
Asm. Patrick O'Donnell [D]Asm. Jim Patterson [R]Asm. Cottie Petrie-Norris [D]Asm. Bill Quirk [D]
Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D]Asm. James Ramos [D]Asm. Anthony Rendon [D]Asm. Eloise Reyes [D]
Asm. Robert Rivas [D]Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D]Asm. Rudy Salas [D]Asm. Miguel Santiago [D]
Asm. Kelly Seyarto [R]Sen. Nancy Skinner [D]Asm. Thurston Smith [R]Sen. Henry Stern [D]
Asm. Mark Stone [D]Asm. Philip Ting [D]Asm. Suzette Martinez Valladares [R]Asm. Carlos Villapudua [D]
Asm. Randy Voepel [R]Asm. Marie Waldron [R]Asm. Chris Ward [D]Asm. Buffy Wicks [D]
Sen. Scott Wiener [D]Asm. Jim Wood [D]

Roll Calls

2021-05-06 - Assembly - SCR 21 Rubio Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-29 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR21 Rubio et al (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-06AssemblyRead. Adopted. (Ayes 76. Noes 0.) Ordered to the Senate.
2021-05-06AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2021-03-15SenateRead. Adopted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 494.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2021-04-29Assembly(Corrected May 3).
2021-04-29AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 29).
2021-04-29AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2021-03-18AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2021-03-15AssemblyIn Assembly. Held at Desk.
2021-03-15SenateRead. Adopted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2021-03-10SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2021-03-08Senate(Corrected March 9).
2021-03-08SenateIntroduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.

California State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback