CA SCR21 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 31, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 31, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Single Parent Day.
Title
Single Parent Day.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-23 - Assembly - SCR 21 Jackson Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR21 Jackson (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-19 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR21 Jackson (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-27 | Senate | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 31, Statutes of 2015. |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4 p.m. |
2015-04-23 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2015-04-23 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 1110.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2015-04-16 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 16). |
2015-04-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-03-19 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 357.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-03-04 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |