CA SCR2 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 46-23-1)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 42, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 46-23-1)
Status: Passed on May 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 42, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Black April Memorial Month.
Title
Black April Memorial Month.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-24 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR2 Nguyen (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR2 Nguyen (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | Senate | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 42, Statutes of 2017. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2017-04-27 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Page 1269.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2017-04-27 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 24). |
2017-04-24 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2017-04-20 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-04-18 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 663.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2017-03-27 | Senate | From inactive file. |
2017-01-13 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Nguyen. |
2017-01-11 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2016-12-05 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |