CA SCR19 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 65-19-1)
Status: Passed on March 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-22 - Read. Adopted. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 568.) Ordered to the Assembly.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to Equal Pay Day.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Equal Pay Day.

Sponsors

Sen. Connie Leyva [D]Asm. Cecilia Aguiar-Curry [D]Asm. Akilah Weber [D]Asm. Joaquin Arambula [D]
Sen. Toni Atkins [D]Asm. Rebecca Bauer-Kahan [D]Asm. Steve Bennett [D]Asm. Marc Berman [D]
Asm. Franklin Bigelow [R]Asm. Blanca Rubio [D]Asm. Richard Bloom [D]Asm. Tasha Horvath [D]
Asm. Rob Bonta [D]Asm. Autumn Burke [D]Sen. Anna Caballero [D]Asm. Lisa Calderon [D]
Asm. Wendy Carrillo [D]Asm. Sabrina Cervantes [D]Asm. Edwin Chau [D]Asm. Phillip Chen [R]
Asm. David Chiu [D]Asm. Steven Choi [R]Asm. Ken Cooley [D]Asm. Jim Cooper [D]
Asm. Cristina Garcia [D]Asm. Jordan Cunningham [R]Asm. Tom Daly [D]Asm. Laurie Davies [R]
Asm. Eduardo Garcia [D]Asm. Heath Flora [R]Asm. Vince Fong [R]Asm. Jim Frazier [D]
Asm. Laura Friedman [D]Asm. Jesse Gabriel [D]Asm. James Gallagher [R]Asm. Mike Gipson [D]
Sen. Lena Gonzalez [D]Asm. Adam Gray [D]Asm. Tim Grayson [D]Asm. Jacqui Irwin [D]
Asm. Reginald Jones-Sawyer [D]Asm. Ash Kalra [D]Asm. Kevin Kiley [R]Asm. Tom Lackey [R]
Asm. Alex Lee [D]Asm. Marc Levine [D]Sen. Monique Limon [D]Asm. Lorena Gonzalez Fletcher [D]
Asm. Evan Low [D]Asm. Luz Rivas [D]Asm. Brian Maienschein [D]Asm. Devon Mathis [R]
Asm. Chad Mayes [I]Asm. Kevin McCarty [D]Asm. Jose Medina [D]Asm. Megan Dahle [R]
Asm. Kevin Mullin [D]Asm. Al Muratsuchi [D]Asm. Adrin Nazarian [D]Asm. Janet Nguyen [R]
Asm. Patrick O'Donnell [D]Asm. Jim Patterson [R]Asm. Cottie Petrie-Norris [D]Asm. Bill Quirk [D]
Asm. Sharon Quirk-Silva [D]Asm. James Ramos [D]Asm. Anthony Rendon [D]Asm. Eloise Reyes [D]
Asm. Robert Rivas [D]Asm. Freddie Rodriguez [D]Sen. Susan Rubio [D]Asm. Rudy Salas [D]
Asm. Miguel Santiago [D]Asm. Kelly Seyarto [R]Sen. Nancy Skinner [D]Asm. Thurston Smith [R]
Asm. Mark Stone [D]Asm. Philip Ting [D]Asm. Suzette Martinez Valladares [R]Asm. Carlos Villapudua [D]
Asm. Randy Voepel [R]Asm. Marie Waldron [R]Asm. Chris Ward [D]Asm. Buffy Wicks [D]
Asm. Jim Wood [D]

Roll Calls

2021-04-22 - Assembly - SCR 19 Leyva Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR19 Leyva et al (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-22SenateRead. Adopted. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 568.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2021-04-30 Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 22, Statutes of 2021.
2021-04-30 Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11:30 a.m.
2021-04-26SenateIn Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2021-04-22AssemblyRead. Adopted. Ordered to the Senate.
2021-04-22AssemblyCoauthors revised.
2021-04-15AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 15).
2021-04-08AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2021-03-22AssemblyIn Assembly. Held at Desk.
2021-03-22SenateRead. Adopted. (Ayes 35. Noes 0.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2021-03-17SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2021-03-08SenateIntroduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.

California State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback