CA SCR19 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 53-21)
Status: Passed on May 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 30, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 53-21)
Status: Passed on May 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 30, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the United Way.
Title
The United Way.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-02 - Senate - Unfinished Business SCR19 Evans (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-15 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-18 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR19 Evans (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-15 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-18 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR19 Evans (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-08 | Senate | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 30, Statutes of 2013. |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11:45 a.m. |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 1. Page 775.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2013-04-29 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2013-04-25 | Assembly | Read. Amended. Adopted. (Page 1116.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2013-04-15 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 15). |
2013-04-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-03-18 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 30. Noes 1. Page 309.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2013-03-14 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |