CA SCR18 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 70-19)
Status: Passed on March 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 9, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 70-19)
Status: Passed on March 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 9, Statutes of 2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Wear Red Day and American Heart Month.
Title
Wear Red Day and American Heart Month.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-23 - Assembly - SCR 18 Menjivar Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-17 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR18 Menjivar et al (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-02-17 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR18 Menjivar et al (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-09 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 9, Statutes of 2023. | |
2023-03-09 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m. | |
2023-02-27 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2023-02-23 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 457.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2023-02-23 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2023-02-17 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (February 17). |
2023-02-17 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2023-02-13 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 178.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2023-02-09 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |