CA SCR18 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 39, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 3 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-03 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 39, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to organ and tissue donation.
Title
Donate Life/DMV Partnership Month.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-27 - Assembly - SCR 18 Berryhill, T. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR18 Berryhill et al. By Allen (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR18 Berryhill et al. By Allen (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-03 | Senate | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 39, Statutes of 2017. |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11 a.m. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2017-04-27 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 1271.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2017-04-20 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 20). |
2017-04-06 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-04-04 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 580.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | From inactive file. |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Berryhill. |
2017-02-01 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |