CA SCR160 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-6)
Status: Passed on September 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 235, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to California Metastatic Breast Cancer Awareness Day.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Metastatic Breast Cancer Awareness Day.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-28 - Assembly - SCR 160 McGuire Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-24 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR160 McGuire et al (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-11SenateChaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 235, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-11SenateEnrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m.
2018-08-29SenateIn Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-08-28AssemblyRead. Adopted. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6736.) Ordered to the Senate.
2018-08-24AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (August 24).
2018-08-23AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2018-08-16AssemblyIn Assembly. Held at Desk.
2018-08-16SenateRead. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5334.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-08-08SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2018-08-06SenateIntroduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback