CA SCR16 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 15, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-07 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 15, Statutes of 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Multiple Sclerosis Awareness Week.
Title
Multiple Sclerosis Awareness Week.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-06 - Senate - Unfinished Business SCR16 Block Concurrence (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - Assembly - SCR 16 Block Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-03-23 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR16 Block (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - Assembly - SCR 16 Block Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-03-23 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR16 Block (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-07 | Senate | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 15, Statutes of 2015. |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 1:45 p.m. |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 483.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2015-03-26 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2015-03-26 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 715.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2015-03-24 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 23). |
2015-03-19 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-03-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2015-03-02 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 263.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2015-02-18 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |