CA SCR16 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 60-32)
Status: Passed on April 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 13, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 60-32)
Status: Passed on April 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 13, Statutes of 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to aerospace.
Title
California Aerospace Month.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-04 - Senate - Unfinished Business SCR16 Knight Concurrence (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Supp 1 SCR16 Knight (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Supp 1 SCR16 Knight (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-08 | Senate | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 13, Statutes of 2013. |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4:30 p.m. |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 411.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2013-04-02 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2013-04-01 | Assembly | Read. Amended. Adopted. (Page 701.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2013-03-21 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (March 21). |
2013-03-19 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-03-11 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. Read. Adopted. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 278.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |