CA SCR16 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 10, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-04 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 10, Statutes of 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Women's History Month and women's suffrage.
Title
Women's history.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-31 - Assembly - SCR 16 Evans Consent Calendar Second Day (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-03-25 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-07 - Senate - W/O REF. TO FILE SCR16 Evans (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-25 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-07 - Senate - W/O REF. TO FILE SCR16 Evans (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-04 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 10, Statutes of 2011. | |
2011-04-04 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 4 p.m. | |
2011-03-31 | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. | |
2011-03-31 | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 769.) Ordered to the Senate. | |
2011-03-25 | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (March 25). | |
2011-03-21 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2011-03-07 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |
2011-03-07 | Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. Read. Adopted. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 294.) Ordered to the Assembly. | |
2011-02-22 | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |