CA SCR16 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 51-31)
Status: Passed on April 24 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 18, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 51-31)
Status: Passed on April 24 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-24 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 18, Statutes of 2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to DMV/Donate Life California Registry.
Title
DMV/Donate Life California Registry.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-04-20 - Senate - Unfinished Business SCR16 Runner (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-02 - Assembly - SCR 16 Runner Senate Third Reading By BERRYHILL, T (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-31 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR16 Runner (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-04-02 - Assembly - SCR 16 Runner Senate Third Reading By BERRYHILL, T (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-31 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR16 Runner (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-24 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 18, Statutes of 2009. | |
2009-04-24 | Enrolled. To Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m. | |
2009-04-20 | Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 542.) To enrollment. | |
2009-04-13 | In Senate. To unfinished business. | |
2009-04-02 | Read, amended, and adopted. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 757.) To Senate. | |
2009-03-31 | From committee: Be adopted. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) To Third Reading. | |
2009-03-23 | To Com. on RULES. | |
2009-03-12 | In Assembly. Held at Desk. | |
2009-03-12 | Read and adopted. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 285.) To Assembly. | |
2009-03-09 | Withdrawn from committee. Placed on third reading. | |
2009-03-02 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |
2009-02-23 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. |