CA SCR159 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 234, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on September 11 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-11 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 234, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the Long Beach Fire Captain David Rosa Memorial Highway.
Title
Long Beach Fire Captain David Rosa Memorial Highway.
Sponsors
Sen. Patricia Bates [R] | Sen. Ricardo Lara [D] | Asm. William Brough [R] | Sen. Janet Nguyen [R] |
Asm. Patrick O'Donnell [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-08-28 - Assembly - SCR 159 Bates Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-24 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR159 Bates et al (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-14 - Senate - Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-24 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR159 Bates et al (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-14 - Senate - Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-11 | Senate | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 234, Statutes of 2018. |
2018-09-11 | Senate | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m. |
2018-08-29 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-08-28 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6736.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-08-24 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 24). |
2018-08-24 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. |
2018-08-23 | Assembly | August 23 hearing postponed by committee. |
2018-08-23 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 22. Page 6480.) |
2018-08-23 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on TRANS. |
2018-08-22 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2018-08-21 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5571.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-08-20 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-08-16 | Senate | From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8. |
2018-08-14 | Senate | Set for hearing August 16. |
2018-08-14 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 5315.) (August 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-08-08 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. |
2018-08-06 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |