CA SCR157 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on September 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 244, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to Italian American Heritage Month.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Italian American Heritage Month.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-31 - Assembly - SCR 157 Portantino Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-16 - Senate - Consent Calendar SCR157 Portantino et al (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-07 - Senate - Be adopted as amended, and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-12SenateChaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 244, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-12SenateEnrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m.
2018-08-31SenateIn Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-08-31AssemblyRead. Adopted. Ordered to the Senate.
2018-08-28AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 29).
2018-08-28AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a) suspended.
2018-08-23AssemblyReferred to Com. on ED.
2018-08-16AssemblyIn Assembly. Held at Desk.
2018-08-16SenateRead. Adopted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 5348.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-08-14SenateRead second time and amended. Ordered to consent calendar.
2018-08-13SenateFrom committee: Be adopted as amended. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 7).
2018-07-03SenateRe-referred to Com. on ED.
2018-06-21SenateIntroduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback