CA SCR154 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-17 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 104, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-08-17 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 104, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to pain awareness.
Title
Pain Awareness Month and Women In Pain Awareness Day.
Sponsors
Sen. Carol Liu [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-08-11 - Assembly - SCR 154 Liu Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-08-08 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR154 Liu (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-08-08 - Assembly - Be adopted, to Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-06-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR154 Liu (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-08-17 | Senate | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 104, Statutes of 2016. |
2016-08-16 | Senate | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 10 a.m. |
2016-08-11 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2016-08-11 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5781.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2016-08-08 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (August 8). |
2016-08-01 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2016-06-30 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2016-06-30 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4639.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2016-06-21 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2016-06-15 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |