CA SCR152 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 128, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 128, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the Native Hawaiian and Pacific Islander community.
Title
Native Hawaiian and Pacific Islander community.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-07-05 - Assembly - SCR 152 Lara Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-02 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR152 Lara et al (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-07-02 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR152 Lara et al (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-12 | Senate | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 128, Statutes of 2018. |
2018-07-12 | Senate | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11:30 a.m. |
2018-07-05 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-07-05 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 6110.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-07-02 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 2). |
2018-06-28 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-06-21 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4824.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-06-20 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2018-06-11 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |