CA SCR143 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 2 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-08-21 - Reconsideration granted.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to smoking.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Smoking: youth: motion picture industry.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-21 - Assembly - Be adopted and re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-07-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR143 Pan (Y: 24 N: 8 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - Senate - Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-21AssemblyReconsideration granted.
2018-08-21AssemblyAugust 21 hearing: Failed passage in committee.
2018-08-06AssemblyReferred to Com. on HEALTH.
2018-07-03AssemblyIn Assembly. Held at Desk.
2018-07-02SenateRead. Adopted. (Ayes 24. Noes 8. Page 5028.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-06-26SenateRead second time. Ordered to third reading.
2018-06-25SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
2018-06-18SenateSet for hearing June 25.
2018-06-06SenateFrom committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 4510.) (June 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-05-18SenateSet for hearing June 6.
2018-05-17SenateRe-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
2018-05-08SenateIntroduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback