CA SCR140 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 110, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-27 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 110, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Elder and Vulnerable Adult Abuse Awareness Month.
Title
Elder and Vulnerable Adult Abuse Awareness Month.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Dodd [D] | Asm. Ash Kalra [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-21 - Assembly - SCR 140 Dodd Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR140 Dodd et al (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-29 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR140 Dodd et al (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-27 | Senate | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 110, Statutes of 2018. |
2018-06-27 | Senate | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m. |
2018-06-21 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-06-21 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5933.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-06-14 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 14). |
2018-06-04 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-05-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4333.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-05-09 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |