CA SCR137 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 52-6-1)
Status: Passed on May 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 78, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 52-6-1)
Status: Passed on May 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-29 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 78, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Foster Care Month.
Title
Foster Care Month.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-14 - Assembly - Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR137 Lara et al (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR137 Lara et al (Y: 32 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-29 | Senate | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 78, Statutes of 2018. |
2018-05-29 | Senate | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m. |
2018-05-21 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-05-17 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Page 5212.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-05-17 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2018-05-14 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 14). |
2018-05-10 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-05-07 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 32. Noes 2. Page 4967.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-05-02 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |