CA SCR135 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-15 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 133, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-15 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 133, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Portugal Day.
Title
Portugal Day.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-08-09 - Assembly - SCR 135 Cannella Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-06 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR135 Cannella et al (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-06 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR135 Cannella et al (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-15 | Senate | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 133, Statutes of 2018. |
2018-08-15 | Senate | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m. |
2018-08-09 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-08-09 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 6217.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-08-06 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 6). |
2018-06-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-06-14 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4651.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-05-24 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Read third time and amended. |
2018-05-02 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |