CA SCR134 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 65, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 65, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to California Peace Officers’ Memorial Day.
Title
California Peace Officers’ Memorial Day.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-07 - Assembly - SCR 134 Galgiani Senate Third Reading By CERVANTES (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR134 Galgiani et al (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR134 Galgiani et al (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-10 | Senate | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 65, Statutes of 2018. |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:30 p.m. |
2018-05-07 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-05-07 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 5038.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-05-07 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 63 suspended. |
2018-05-07 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2018-05-07 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4956.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-05-02 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |