CA SCR133 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3)
Status: Passed on September 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-12 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 243, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the Senator David E. Cogdill, Sr., Memorial Highway.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Senator David E. Cogdill, Sr., Memorial Highway.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-08-31 - Assembly - SCR 133 Berryhill, T. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-29 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-08-09 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR133 Berryhill et al. By Bates (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - Senate - Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-09-12SenateChaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 243, Statutes of 2018.
2018-09-12SenateEnrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m.
2018-08-31SenateIn Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-08-31AssemblyRead. Adopted. Ordered to the Senate.
2018-08-29AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (August 29).
2018-08-28AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a) suspended.
2018-08-23AssemblyAugust 23 hearing postponed by committee.
2018-08-23AssemblyJoint Rule 62(a) suspended. (Ayes 53. Noes 22. Page 6480.)
2018-08-13AssemblyReferred to Com. on TRANS.
2018-08-09AssemblyIn Assembly. Held at Desk.
2018-08-09SenateRead. Adopted. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 5224.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-05-16SenateOrdered to third reading.
2018-05-16SenateFrom consent calendar.
2018-05-15SenateRead second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
2018-05-14SenateFrom committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
2018-05-04SenateSet for hearing May 14.
2018-05-01SenateFrom committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 4905.) (May 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
2018-04-24SenateSet for hearing May 1.
2018-04-19SenateRe-referred to Com. on T. & H.
2018-04-16SenateIntroduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback