CA SCR132 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Assembly without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on November 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-11-30 - From Assembly without further action.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to peace officers.
Title
California Peace Officers' Memorial Day.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR132 Galgiani (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-30 | Assembly | From Assembly without further action. |
2016-11-30 | Assembly | From committee without further action. |
2016-05-02 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2016-04-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3709.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2016-04-20 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |