CA SCR130 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 63, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 63, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to California Congenital Diaphragmatic Hernia Awareness Month.
Title
California Congenital Diaphragmatic Hernia Awareness Month.
Sponsors
Sen. Jean Fuller [R] | Sen. Patricia Bates [R] | Asm. Rocky Chavez [R] | Sen. Bill Dodd [D] |
Asm. Vince Fong [R] | Sen. Ted Gaines [R] | Asm. Devon Mathis [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-03 - Assembly - SCR 130 Fuller Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR130 Fuller et al (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-23 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR130 Fuller et al (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | Senate | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 63, Statutes of 2018. |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:30 p.m. |
2018-05-03 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-05-03 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 5008.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-04-30 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 30). |
2018-04-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-04-23 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 4751.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-04-18 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |