CA SCR13 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 58-19-1)
Status: Passed on May 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-14 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 35, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 58-19-1)
Status: Passed on May 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-14 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 35, Statutes of 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Bleeding Disorders Awareness Month.
Title
Bleeding Disorders Awareness Month.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-29 - Assembly - SCR 13 Pan Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR13 Pan (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-04 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR13 Pan (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-14 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 35, Statutes of 2021. | |
2021-05-14 | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11:30 a.m. | |
2021-05-03 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2021-04-29 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 1254.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2021-04-29 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2021-04-22 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 22). |
2021-03-18 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2021-03-04 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 372.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |