CA SCR128 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 125, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-10 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 125, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the American flag.
Title
American flag.
Sponsors
Sen. Janet Nguyen [R] | Sen. Ted Gaines [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-07-02 - Senate - Unfinished Business SCR128 Nguyen et al. Concurrence (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Assembly - SCR 128 Nguyen Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Senate - Consent Calendar SCR128 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Senate - Be adopted and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Assembly - SCR 128 Nguyen Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-17 - Senate - Consent Calendar SCR128 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-08 - Senate - Be adopted and be ordered to the Consent Calendar (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-10 | Senate | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 125, Statutes of 2018. |
2018-07-10 | Senate | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m. |
2018-07-02 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 5024.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-06-18 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2018-06-14 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 5822.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-06-12 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 12). |
2018-06-12 | Assembly | Coauthors revised. |
2018-06-07 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-06-06 | Assembly | June 12 hearing canceled at the request of author. |
2018-05-21 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-05-17 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5089.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. |
2018-05-09 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 4998.) (May 8). |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Set for hearing May 8. |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |