CA SCR128 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 70, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-09 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 70, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the Buffalo Soldiers.
Title
The Buffalo Soldiers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-01 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR128 Mendoza (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-02 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR128 Mendoza (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-09 | Senate | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 70, Statutes of 2016. |
2016-06-09 | Senate | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m. |
2016-06-06 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2016-06-06 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Page 5278.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2016-06-01 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 1). |
2016-05-27 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. |
2016-05-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on V.A. |
2016-05-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2016-05-02 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3739.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-04-27 | Senate | Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading. |
2016-04-11 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2016-04-06 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |