CA SCR125 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-15 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 66, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to Autism Awareness Month.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Autism Awareness Month.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-10 - Assembly - SCR 125 Hueso Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-07 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR125 Hueso et al (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-15SenateChaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 66, Statutes of 2018.
2018-05-15SenateEnrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:30 p.m.
2018-05-10SenateIn Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
2018-05-10AssemblyRead. Adopted. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5134.) Ordered to the Senate.
2018-05-07AssemblyFrom committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 7).
2018-05-03AssemblyReferred to Com. on RLS.
2018-04-30AssemblyIn Assembly. Held at Desk.
2018-04-30SenateRead. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4873.) Ordered to the Assembly.
2018-04-11SenateFrom committee: Ordered to third reading.
2018-04-02SenateIntroduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback