CA SCR123 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 71, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 71, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Arab American Heritage Month.
Title
Arab American Heritage Month.
Sponsors
Sen. Josh Newman [D] | Asm. Sabrina Cervantes [D] | Sen. Bill Dodd [D] | Asm. Ash Kalra [D] |
Asm. Eloise Reyes [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-05-17 - Assembly - SCR 123 Newman Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR123 Newman et al (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-09 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR123 Newman et al (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-23 | Senate | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 71, Statutes of 2018. |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m. |
2018-05-17 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-05-17 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 5220.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-05-10 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (May 10). |
2018-04-19 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-04-09 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2018-04-09 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4562.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |