CA SCR12 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 123, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 123, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Philippine Independence Day.
Title
Philippine Independence Day.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-08-24 - Senate - Special Consent SCR12 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-06 - Assembly - SCR 12 Pan Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-03 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR12 Pan (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-06 - Assembly - SCR 12 Pan Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-07-03 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-19 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR12 Pan (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-30 | Senate | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 123, Statutes of 2017. |
2017-08-30 | Senate | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 11 a.m. |
2017-08-24 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2232.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2017-08-22 | Senate | Ordered to special consent calendar. |
2017-07-06 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2017-07-06 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. Ordered to the Senate. |
2017-07-03 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 3). |
2017-06-27 | Assembly | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-06-26 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-06-20 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1605.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-06-12 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2017-06-08 | Senate | From inactive file. |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Pan. |
2017-01-11 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2017-01-04 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |