CA SCR119 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 61, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-08 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 61, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to California YMCA Safety Around Water Month.
Title
May 2018: California YMCA Safety Around Water Month.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-03 - Assembly - SCR 119 Jackson Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR119 Jackson (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR119 Jackson (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | Senate | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 61, Statutes of 2018. |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3:30 p.m. |
2018-05-03 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-05-03 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 5008.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-04-26 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 26). |
2018-04-09 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2018-04-05 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4543.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |