CA SCR112 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-08 - Referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-08 - Referred to Com. on RLS.
Pending: Assembly Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Car Care Month.
Title
Car Care Month.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR112 Berryhill (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-08 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2014-04-28 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2014-04-28 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 3268.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2014-04-23 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |