CA SCR11 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 21, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-28 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 21, Statutes of 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to a Day of Remembrance.
Title
Day of Remembrance.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-23 - Assembly - SCR 11 Pan Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR11 Pan (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Assembly - Be adopted. To Consent Calendar (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR11 Pan (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-28 | Senate | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 21, Statutes of 2017. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2 p.m. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2017-03-23 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 724.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2017-03-16 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (March 16). |
2017-03-13 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2017-02-13 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 175.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Ordered to second reading. |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Read third time and amended. |
2017-01-11 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2017-01-04 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |