CA SCR105 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 47-25-1)
Status: Passed on March 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-17 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 19, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 47-25-1)
Status: Passed on March 17 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-17 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 19, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to Pakistani American Day.
Title
Pakistani American Day.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-14 - Senate - Unfinished Business (S upplemental File 1)SCR 105 Men doza Con (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR105 Mendoza (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-18 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR105 Mendoza (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-17 | Senate | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 19, Statutes of 2016. |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 3 p.m. |
2016-03-14 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 3218.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2016-03-14 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2016-03-10 | Assembly | Read. Amended. Adopted. Ordered to the Senate. |
2016-03-09 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 8). |
2016-03-03 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2016-02-18 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 3068.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2016-02-17 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |