CA SCR103 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 63-29-1)
Status: Passed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 49, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 63-29-1)
Status: Passed on June 1 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-01 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 49, Statutes of 2016.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to teen dating and violence prevention.
Title
Teen Dating Violence Awareness and Prevention Month.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-26 - Senate - Unfinished Business SCR103 Leyva Concurrence (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-28 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR103 Leyva (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-28 - Assembly - From committee: Be adopted. To third reading (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCR103 Leyva (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-01 | Senate | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 49, Statutes of 2016. |
2016-06-01 | Senate | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 2:30 p.m. |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3952.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2016-05-23 | Senate | In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending. |
2016-05-19 | Assembly | Read. Amended. Adopted. (Page 4868.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2016-05-12 | Assembly | Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. |
2016-04-28 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 28). |
2016-04-11 | Assembly | Referred to Com. on RLS. |
2016-02-25 | Assembly | In Assembly. Held at Desk. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 3131.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2016-02-17 | Senate | From committee: Ordered to third reading. |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Introduced. Referred to Com. on RLS. |