CA SCR100 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-09 - From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
Pending: Senate Environmental Quality Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the Safe Drinking Water and Toxic Enforcement Act of 1986.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Safe Drinking Water and Toxic Enforcement Act of 1986: list of chemicals known to cause cancer or reproductive toxicity: processed meat.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-09SenateFrom committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
2018-03-29SenateSet for hearing April 18.
2018-02-22SenateRe-referred to Com. on EQ.
2018-02-12SenateIntroduced. Referred to Com. on RLS.

California State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback