CA SCA9 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 1, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 30 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-30 - Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 1, Statutes of 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
A resolution to propose to the people of the State of California an amendment to the Constitution of the State, by amending subdivision (c) of Section 2 of Article XIII A thereof, relating to taxation.
Title
Property tax: new construction exclusion: rain water capture system.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-29 - Assembly - SCA 9 Glazer Senate Third Reading By GONZALEZ FLETCHER (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Assembly - Be adopted (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - Assembly - Be adopted and re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCA9 Glazer (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Be adopted (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Be adopted as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Elections and Constitutional Amendments] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Assembly - Be adopted (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - Assembly - Be adopted and re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading SCA9 Glazer (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-01 - Senate - Be adopted (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-26 - Senate - Placed on suspense file (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-06 - Senate - Be adopted, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Be adopted as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Elections and Constitutional Amendments] (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-30 | Senate | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Res. Chapter 1, Statutes of 2018. |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Enrolled and filed with the Secretary of State at 9:30 a.m. |
2018-01-29 | Senate | In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling. |
2018-01-29 | Assembly | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 3848.) Ordered to the Senate. |
2018-01-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2018-01-18 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (January 18). |
2018-01-18 | Assembly | January 18 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2018-01-16 | Assembly | From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (January 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2018-01-16 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 56 suspended. |
2018-01-16 | Assembly | Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. |
2018-01-08 | Assembly | January 8 hearing postponed by committee. |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on REV. & TAX. and APPR. |
2017-09-06 | Assembly | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. |
2017-09-06 | Senate | Read. Adopted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2519.) Ordered to the Assembly. |
2017-09-05 | Senate | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. |
2017-09-01 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (September 1). |
2017-08-25 | Senate | Set for hearing September 1. |
2017-06-26 | Senate | June 26 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file. |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Set for hearing June 26. |
2017-06-06 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 1432.) (June 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Set for hearing June 6. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted as amended and re-refer to Com. on E. & C.A. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 745.) (April 19). |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Set for hearing April 19. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F., E. & C.A., and APPR. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 19. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |