CA SCA9 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 18 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-06-27 - Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 18 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-06-27 - Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
A resolution to propose to the people of the State of California an amendment to the Constitution of the State, by amending Section 4 of Article XIII A thereof, and by amending Section 2 of Article XIII C thereof, relating to taxation.
Title
Local government: economic development: special taxes: voter approval.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-18 - Senate - Be adopted, but re-refer to the Committee on Rules (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-15 - Senate - Be adopted as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Elections and Constitutional Amendments (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-15 - Senate - Be adopted as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Elections and Constitutional Amendments (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-15 - Senate - Be adopted as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Elections and Constitutional Amendments (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-15 - Senate - Be adopted as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Elections and Constitutional Amendments (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-27 | Senate | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2013-06-19 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 3. Noes 0. Page 1421.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on RLS. |
2013-06-07 | Senate | Set for hearing June 18. |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A. |
2013-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Be adopted as amended and re-refer to Com. on E. & C.A. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 937.) (May 15). |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Set for hearing May 15. |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Hearing postponed by committee. |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Set for hearing May 8. |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F. and E. & C.A. |
2013-01-07 | Senate | Read first time. |
2012-12-19 | Senate | From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 18. |
2012-12-18 | Senate | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |