CA SCA9 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-25 - Hearing postponed by committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-25 - Hearing postponed by committee.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A resolution to propose to the people of the State of California an amendment to the Constitution of the State, by amending Section 10 of Article II thereof, relating to initiatives.
Title
Initiatives.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-25 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |
2011-04-12 | Set for hearing May 3. | |
2011-03-10 | Referred to Com. on E. & C.A. | |
2011-02-17 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |
California State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/cgi-bin/postquery?bill_number=sca_9&sess=1112&house=S |
Text | http://www.leginfo.ca.gov/pub/11-12/bill/sen/sb_0001-0050/sca_9_bill_20110217_introduced.html |